Johnson v. Solara, LLC

Plaintiff: Eileen Johnson
Defendant: Solara, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00203
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2018 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Zorea, Isaac)
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of procedures to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 9/25/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 18, 2018 Filing 10 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
September 17, 2018 Filing 9 ERRATA by Solara, LLC #5 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Solara, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Rankin, Christina)
September 17, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Solara, LLC (Attachments: #1 State Notice re Removal)(Rankin, Christina)
September 17, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Solara, LLC (Rankin, Christina)
September 17, 2018 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Solara, LLC. (Rankin, Christina)
September 17, 2018 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Solara, LLC. (Rankin, Christina)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 10, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Solara, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Rankin, Christina)
September 10, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Rankin, Christina)
September 10, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Solara, LLC from Anchorage Superior Court, case number 3AN-18-07476 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2575599), filed by Solara, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Rankin, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Solara, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eileen Johnson
Represented By: Isaac D. Zorea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solara, LLC
Represented By: Christina A. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?