Leibold v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Michelle Leibold
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00209
Filed: September 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2018 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Farley, Laura)
November 8, 2018 Filing 9 Proposed Pretrial Order Scheduling and Planning Conference Report by Michelle Leibold. (Barber, Jeffrey)
October 11, 2018 Filing 8 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
October 5, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Farley, Laura)
September 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of procedures to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 9/24/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
September 20, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Farley, Laura)
September 18, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Farley, Laura)
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 17, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
September 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Superior Court for the State of Alaska, case number 3AN-18-08550 CI. ( Filing fee $400/receipt #ANC014882), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leibold v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Laura L. Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Leibold
Represented By: Jeffrey J. Barber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?