LIVING THE DREAM ALASKA, LLC v. MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC
Plaintiff: LIVING THE DREAM ALASKA, LLC
Defendant: MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00235
Filed: October 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 2/4/2019. Discovery due by 10/21/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 1/4/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 11/29/2019. See document for all other deadlines. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 11/20/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
November 14, 2018 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Dudukgian, Goriune)
November 5, 2018 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC. (Thorsness, John)
October 30, 2018 Filing 7 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Thorsness, John)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of procedures to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 10/16/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
October 15, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC (Thorsness, John)
October 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
October 5, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
October 5, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC from Superior Court for the State of Alaska, First Judicial District, case number 1JU-18-00901CI. ( Filing fee $ 400-Receipt #ANC014) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(LMH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 10/5/2018 (BJK, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LIVING THE DREAM ALASKA, LLC v. MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MERCEDES-BENZ USA, LLC
Represented By: John B. Thorsness
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LIVING THE DREAM ALASKA, LLC
Represented By: James J. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Goriune Dudukgian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?