Tester Drilling Services, Inc. v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Tester Drilling Services, Inc.
Defendant: Unit-Ascrc Construction, LLC, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America and Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00244
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:270
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2018 Filing 12 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
December 5, 2018 Filing 11 ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Tester Drilling Services, Inc..(Freeman, David)
December 4, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Todd Blischke by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.(Dishaw, Meredith)
December 4, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Meredith Dishaw by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.(Dishaw, Meredith)
December 4, 2018 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America.(Dishaw, Meredith)
November 14, 2018 Filing 7 DEFENDANT UNIT-ASRC CONSTRUCTION, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint and, COUNTERCLAIM against Tester Drilling Services, Inc. by Unit-Ascrc Construction, LLC.(Geraghty, Michael)
October 24, 2018 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John S. Riper, at docket #4 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF)
October 23, 2018 Filing 5 Receipt of 150.00 non-resident attorney payment for John S. Riper as to Plaintiff Tester Drilling Services, Inc. re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney John S. Riper (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 23, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney John S. Riper by Tester Drilling Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Non-Eligible Attorney)(Freeman, David)
October 16, 2018 Summons Issued as to Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, Unit-Ascrc Construction, LLC. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 16, 2018 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America, (Attachments: #1 Liberty Mutual Insurance Co., #2 Unit-Asrc Construction, LLC)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 15, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Freeman, David)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2594797.), filed by Tester Drilling Services, Inc..(Freeman, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tester Drilling Services, Inc. v. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unit-Ascrc Construction, LLC
Represented By: Michael C. Geraghty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Meredith Eileen Dishaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Meredith Eileen Dishaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tester Drilling Services, Inc.
Represented By: David M. Freeman
Represented By: John Stephen Riper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?