Pederson v. Morse et al
Plaintiff: Rodney S. Pederson
Defendant: Michael Corey, William Morse, Andrew Peterson, James E. Torgerson and Erin Marston
Case Number: 3:2018cv00252
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 14, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Michael Corey, Erin Marston, William Morse, Andrew Peterson.(Metzger, Julia)
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by James E. Torgerson.(Pallesen, Bryn)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendant Judges Corey, Marston, Morse, and Peterson answer due 12/14/2018. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 11/14/18. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
November 13, 2018 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Julia C. Metzger re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT JUDGES MORSE, COREY, MARSTON, AND PETERSON TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Michael Corey, Erin Marston, William Morse, Andrew Peterson. (Metzger, Julia)
November 13, 2018 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT JUDGES MORSE, COREY, MARSTON, AND PETERSON TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Michael Corey, Erin Marston, William Morse, Andrew Peterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Metzger, Julia)
November 9, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M. Feldman on behalf of James E. Torgerson (Feldman, Jeffrey)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. James E. Torgerson answer due 12/14/2018. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 11/9/18. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
November 8, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryn Resser Pallesen on behalf of James E. Torgerson (Pallesen, Bryn)
November 8, 2018 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Bryn R. Pallesen re #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by James E. Torgerson. (Pallesen, Bryn)
November 8, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by James E. Torgerson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pallesen, Bryn)
October 30, 2018 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT - Service by Certified Mail Summons Returned Executed by Rodney S. Pederson. Michael Corey served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018; Erin Marston served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018; William Morse served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018; Andrew Peterson served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018; James E. Torgerson served on 10/24/2018, answer due 11/14/2018. (Attachments: #1 certified mail receipt)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 23, 2018 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant William Morse, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Michael Corey, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Erin Marston, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Andrew Peterson, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant James E.Torgerson)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Michael Corey, Erin Marston, William Morse, Andrew Peterson, James E. Torgerson (Filing fee $400/Receipt #ANC015032.), filed by Rodney S. Pederson. (Attachments: #1 List of Attachments, #2 1, #3 2, #4 3, #5 4, #6 5, #7 6, #8 7, #9 8, #10 9, #11 10, #12 11)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 23, 2018 Summons Issued as to Michael Corey, Erin Marston, William Morse, Andrew Peterson, James E. Torgerson. (PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pederson v. Morse et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Corey
Represented By: Julia Christine Young Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Morse
Represented By: Julia Christine Young Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Peterson
Represented By: Julia Christine Young Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James E. Torgerson
Represented By: Bryn Resser Pallesen
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Feldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Marston
Represented By: Julia Christine Young Metzger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney S. Pederson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?