Bynum v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Robert Bynum
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2018cv00255
Filed: October 24, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER re Case Dismissed. This case is dismissed with prejudice, the parties to bear their respective costs and attorney fees. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 12/12/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 11, 2018 Filing 12 STIPULATION of Dismissal WITH PREJUDICE by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Rankin, Christina)
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re Report Past Due. If counsel have not conferred with respect to scheduling, they shall do so forthwith and file their joint scheduling and planning report by 12/18/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
November 16, 2018 Filing 10 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report by 12/7/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
November 6, 2018 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Rankin, Christina)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 11/6/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
November 2, 2018 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Rankin, Christina)
November 2, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Jury Demand)(Rankin, Christina)
November 2, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company (Rankin, Christina)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 24, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Rankin, Christina)
October 24, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Rankin, Christina)
October 24, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company from Palmer District Court, case number 3PA-18-02388 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2599878), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit State Notice re Removal)(Rankin, Christina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bynum v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bynum
Represented By: Mark D. Rayburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Christina A. Rankin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?