Asante v. United States Department of State et al
Plaintiff: Candace Jane Asante
Defendant: Michael R. Pompeo, John Doe, United States Department of State, U.S. Consulate in Ghana and Chief, Immigrant Visa Section
Case Number: 3:2018cv00256
Filed: October 25, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. United States Department of State answer due 1/15/2019. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 12/19/18. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
December 12, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer [Unopposed] by Chief, Immigrant Visa Section, John Doe, Michael R. Pompeo, U.S. Consulate in Ghana, United States Department of State. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pomeroy, Richard)
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Candace Jane Asante re Summons Issued as to USA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proof of Service for the Chief of Immigrant Visa Section, U.S. Consulate in Ghana, #2 Exhibit Proof of Service for Officer John Doe, #3 Exhibit Proof of Service for Michael R. Pompeo, #4 Exhibit Proof of Service for Civil Process Clerk, U.S. Attorney's Office, #5 Exhibit Proof of Service for U.S. Consulate in Ghana, #6 Exhibit Proof of Service for U.S. Department of State, #7 Exhibit USPS Return Receipt for U.S. Department of State Office of Legal Adviser, #8 Exhibit USPS Return Receipt for U.S. Attorney's Office, #9 Exhibit USPS Return Receipt for Attorney General)(Stock, Margaret)
October 25, 2018 Summons Issued as to Chief, Immigrant Visa Section, Michael R. Pompeo, U.S. Consulate in Ghana, United States Department of State, John Doe, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 25, 2018 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Department of State, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Michael R. Pompeo, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant United States Consulate in Ghana, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Chief of Immigration Visa Section, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General, #5 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney, #6 Unissued Summons re Defendant John Doe, Visa Officer)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 25, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
October 25, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2600300.), filed by Candace Jane Asante. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stock, Margaret)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asante v. United States Department of State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael R. Pompeo
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Consulate in Ghana
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief, Immigrant Visa Section
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Jane Asante
Represented By: Margaret D. Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?