State of Alaska v. United States of America
Plaintiff: State of Alaska
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2018cv00265
Filed: November 8, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Referring Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report by 2/6/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca Jane Jaffe on behalf of United States of America (Jaffe, Rebecca)
November 27, 2018 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint served on Brian Schroder, Matthew Whitaker on November 14, November 19, 2018, filed by State of Alaska. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Alloway, Jessica)
November 26, 2018 Filing 4 TMB TEXT ORDER: Chief Judge Timothy M. Burgess hereby recuses himself from the above-referenced case. Pursuant to the system of random case assignments, this action is reassigned to Senior Judge H. Russel Holland for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:18-cv-00265-HRH. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
November 8, 2018 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 8, 2018 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
November 8, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Alloway, Jessica)
November 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Complaint to Quiet Title against United States of America ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2607696.), filed by State of Alaska. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2)(Alloway, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Alaska v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Alaska
Represented By: Jessica Moats Alloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Rebecca Jane Jaffe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?