Curtis et al v. Providence Health & Services et al

Plaintiff: M.D. Pedro Valdes and M.D. William Curtis
Defendant: Bruce Lamoureux, Providence Health & Services - Washington and Providence Health & Services
Case Number: 3:2018cv00281
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE re #16 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas C. Ross, at docket #16 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 16, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed by Bruce Lamoureux, Providence Health & Services, Providence Health & Services - Washington. (Dawson, Jon)
January 16, 2019 Filing 19 Receipt of 150.00 non-resident attorney payment for Douglas C. Ross as to Defendant Bruce Lamoureux, Providence Health & Services, Providence Health & Services - Washington. re #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Douglas C. Ross (PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 8, 2019 Filing 18 REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 Second MOTION to Remand Reply to Opposition to Plaintiffs' Second Motion for Remand filed by William Curtis. (Shoup, David)
January 3, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Amended Motion and Application of Non-Eligible Attorney for Permission to Appear and Participate by Bruce Lamoureux, Providence Health & Services, Providence Health & Services - Washington re #16 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Douglas C. Ross (Attachments: #1 Amended Motion & Application to Appear)(Dawson, Jon)
January 2, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Douglas C. Ross by Bruce Lamoureux, Providence Health & Services, Providence Health & Services - Washington.(Dawson, Jon)
January 2, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by William Curtis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shoup, David)
December 28, 2018 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 Second MOTION to Remand filed by Providence Health & Services - Washington. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dawson, Jon)
December 14, 2018 Filing 13 Second MOTION to Remand by William Curtis, Pedro Valdes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Shoup, David)
December 13, 2018 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Providence Health & Services. (Dawson, Jon)
December 13, 2018 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Providence Health & Services - Washington. (Dawson, Jon)
December 13, 2018 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Sheri Kelly In Support of Motion to Dismiss re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bruce Lamoureux, Providence Health & Services, Providence Health & Services - Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dawson, Jon)
December 13, 2018 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Bruce Lamoureux, Providence Health & Services, Providence Health & Services - Washington.(Dawson, Jon)
December 11, 2018 Filing 8 NOTICE of Compliance with Order Subsequent to Removal by Bruce Lamoureux, Providence Health & Services, Providence Health & Services - Washington re #3 Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal (Dawson, Jon)
December 11, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by All Defendants (Dawson, Jon)
December 7, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Joinder in and Consent to Removal by Bruce Lamoureux re #1 Notice of Removal, (Broadwell, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Joinder in and Consent to Removal by Providence Health & Services re #1 Notice of Removal, (Broadwell, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Filing 4 ERRATA by Providence Health & Services - Washington #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Providence Health & Services - Washington. (Broadwell, Michael)
December 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Dawson, Jon)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Providence Health & Services - Washington from Superior Court- Third Judicial District Alaska, case number 3AN-18-09069CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2618550), filed by Providence Health & Services - Washington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Docs, #3 Exhibit C - Decl of Whipple, #4 Exhibit D - Decl of Newcombe, #5 Exhibit E - State Ct Notice)(Dawson, Jon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis et al v. Providence Health & Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Lamoureux
Represented By: Jon S. Dawson
Represented By: Michael Scott Broadwell
Represented By: Douglas C. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health & Services - Washington
Represented By: Jon S. Dawson
Represented By: Michael Scott Broadwell
Represented By: Douglas C. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health & Services
Represented By: Michael Scott Broadwell
Represented By: Jon S. Dawson
Represented By: Douglas C. Ross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D. Pedro Valdes
Represented By: David H. Shoup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D. William Curtis
Represented By: David H. Shoup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?