Holger v. Phillips et al

Plaintiff: Louis Holger
Defendant: Beth Phillips, American British Accredited Registry Association Inc. and Paige Wymore-Wynn
Case Number: 3:2018cv00284
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT THAT this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, as required by 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(e)(2)(B) (ii). This dismissal constitutes a "strike" under 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(g). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 01/22/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
January 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: Mr. Holgers action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted, as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). Application to Proceed without Prepaying Fees or Costs at Docket #3 is DENIED as moot. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 01/22/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/Notice of Upcoming Lawsuit by Louis Holger. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 2, 2019 Filing 4 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to L. Holger re #1 , #2 , #3 . (LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Louis Holger. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(LMH, COURT STAFF)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (LMH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 12/10/2018 to fix file date(LMH, COURT STAFF).
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against American British Accredited Registry Association Inc., Beth Phillips, Paige Wymore-Wynn, filed by Louis Holger. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3, #4 Attachment 4, #5 Attachment 5)(LMH, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holger v. Phillips et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American British Accredited Registry Association Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paige Wymore-Wynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Louis Holger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?