Don v. OneBeacon Insurance Group, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Wayne Don
Defendant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company and OneBeacon Insurance Group, LLC
Case Number: 3:2018cv00292
Filed: December 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants shall file their response to the complaint by 2/15/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer UNOPPOSED by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, OneBeacon Insurance Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guadagno, Michael)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The defendants shall file their response to the complaint by 2/8/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer UNOPPOSED by Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, OneBeacon Insurance Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Guadagno, Michael)
January 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Lodging Proof of Service by Wayne Don (Fortier, Samuel)
January 14, 2019 Filing 8 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report by 2/19/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael A. Guadagno on behalf of Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, OneBeacon Insurance Group, LLC (Guadagno, Michael)
January 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF LODGING by Wayne Don (Fortier, Samuel)
January 3, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wayne Don (Fortier, Samuel)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 12/31/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 14, 2018 Summons Issued as to Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, OneBeacon Insurance Group, LLC. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 14, 2018 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant OneBeacon Insurance Group, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Specialty Insurance Company)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 13, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 13, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company, OneBeacon Insurance Group, LLC (Filing fee $400/Receipt #ANC015243.), filed by Wayne Don. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Don v. OneBeacon Insurance Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlantic Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael A. Guadagno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneBeacon Insurance Group, LLC
Represented By: Michael A. Guadagno
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Don
Represented By: Samuel J. Fortier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?