Wright v. Walmart, Inc.

Plaintiff: Tina Wright
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00295
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Discovery completed by 2/28/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/29/2020. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 1/25/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 24, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Pretrial Order Scheduling and Planning Conference Report by Tina Wright. (Thompson, Darryl)
January 11, 2019 Filing 10 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Walmart, Inc.. (Gutsch, Kenneth)
January 11, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Walmart, Inc..(Gutsch, Kenneth)
January 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Walmart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Gutsch, Kenneth)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 12/31/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 31, 2018 Filing 6 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report by 1/24/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart, Inc.. (Gutsch, Kenneth)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Walmart, Inc. (Gutsch, Kenneth)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc. from Superior Court for the State of Alaska, Third Judicial District at Anchorage, case number 3AN-18-10671 CI. ( Filing fee $400/receipt #ANC015248), filed by Walmart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wright v. Walmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Wright
Represented By: Theodore J. Stepovich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Kenneth M. Gutsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?