T & H Services, LLC v. Choctaw Defense Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: T & H Services, LLC
Defendant: Choctaw Defense Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2018cv00296
Filed: December 17, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE re #11 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Graydon D. Luthey, Jr., at docket #11 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 7, 2019 Filing 12 Receipt of 150.00 non-resident attorney payment for Graydon D. Luthey Jr. as to Plaintiff T & H Services, LLC. re #11 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Graydon D. Luthey, Jr. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 1, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Graydon D. Luthey, Jr. by T & H Services, LLC.(Luthey, Graydon)
January 20, 2019 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Choctaw Defense Services, Inc.'s answer is due 2/19/2019. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
January 18, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by T & H Services, LLC. (Williams, Christine)
January 18, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by T & H Services, LLC Proof of Service (Williams, Christine)
January 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint Unopposed by Choctaw Defense Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tucker, S)
January 17, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Choctaw Defense Services, Inc.. (Tucker, S)
January 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by S Lane Tucker on behalf of Choctaw Defense Services, Inc. (Tucker, S)
December 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 12/31/18. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 17, 2018 Summons Issued as to Choctaw Defense Services, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 17, 2018 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Choctaw Defense Services, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
December 17, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Choctaw Defense Services, Inc. (Filing fee $400/Receipt #ANC015254), filed by T & H Services, LLC.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T & H Services, LLC v. Choctaw Defense Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T & H Services, LLC
Represented By: Christine Victoria Williams
Represented By: Graydon Dean Luthey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Choctaw Defense Services, Inc.
Represented By: S Lane Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?