Mothership Fleet Cooperative et al v. Ross et al

Plaintiff: Meddar Corporation, Mothership Fleet Cooperative, James Mize and F/V Western Dawn L.L.C.
Defendant: Wilbur Ross, Jr., National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration and National Marine Fisheries Service
Case Number: 3:2018cv00303
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Referring Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05:0701
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Related Cases, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice re cases related, Notice re reassigned to TMB served on Wilbur Ross, Jr., Matthew G. Whitaker, National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration on 1/30/2019, filed by F/V Western Dawn L.L.C., Meddar Corporation, James Mize, Mothership Fleet Cooperative. (Stahl, John)
January 8, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE re #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by John David Stahl, at docket #6 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (RMC, COURT STAFF)
December 27, 2018 Filing 8 JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: By agreement of the Judges, the above referenced case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Timothy M. Burgess for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:18-cv-00303-TMB. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 27, 2018 Filing 7 NOTICE: This case is related to case numbers 3:16-cv-00031-TMB, 3:16-cv-00293-TMB, and 3:17-cv-00262-TMB, which are assigned to the Honorable Judge Timothy M. Burgess. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
December 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney J. David Stahl. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2627957.) by F/V Western Dawn L.L.C., Meddar Corporation, James Mize, Mothership Fleet Cooperative.(Stahl, John)
December 27, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Cases by F/V Western Dawn L.L.C., Meddar Corporation, James Mize, Mothership Fleet Cooperative (Stahl, John)
December 27, 2018 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by F/V Western Dawn L.L.C., Meddar Corporation, James Mize, Mothership Fleet Cooperative. (Stahl, John)
December 26, 2018 Summons Issued as to National Marine Fisheries Service, National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, Wilbur Ross, Jr, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Wilbur Ross, Jr., (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant National Marine Fisheriers Service, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant US Attorney, #4 Unissued Summons re Defendant US Attorney General)(BJK, COURT STAFF)
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Stahl, John)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2627539.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Stahl, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mothership Fleet Cooperative et al v. Ross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilbur Ross, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Marine Fisheries Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meddar Corporation
Represented By: John David Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mothership Fleet Cooperative
Represented By: John David Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Mize
Represented By: John David Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F/V Western Dawn L.L.C.
Represented By: John David Stahl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?