Jarnig v. Lyou
Petitioner: Jonathan Neal Jarnig
Respondent: Chris Lyou
Case Number: 3:2018cv00306
Filed: December 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2019 Filing 3 JUDGMENT: The 28:2241 petition is dismissed with prejudice. A certificate of appealability shall not issue. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 2/19/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 2/20/2019 to correct typo.(RMC, COURT STAFF).
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER DISMISSING with prejudice #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Jonathan Neal Jarnig signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 2/1/2019. Clerk of Court is directed to enter final judgment accordingly. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jonathan Neal Jarnig. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(BJK, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jarnig v. Lyou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chris Lyou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jonathan Neal Jarnig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?