Dalby v. Ditech Financial LLC et al

Plaintiff: John S. Dalby
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association and Ditech Financial LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00003
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Amend/Correct by John S. Dalby. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Feronti, Nicholas)
March 6, 2019 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM In Support of Motion to Remand by John S. Dalby #13 MOTION to Remand filed by John S. Dalby. (Feronti, Nicholas)
March 6, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand by John S. Dalby.(Feronti, Nicholas)
March 4, 2019 Filing 12 SLG TEXT ORDER: re #11 Notice of Bankruptcy Filing and Imposition of Automatic Stay pending Defendant Ditech Financial LLC filing of Bankruptcy, the court STAYS this matter, as to Ditech Financial LLC ONLY, pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 101 until the conclusion of Defendant Ditech Financial LLC Bankruptcy proceedings. The Court Orders the parties to file a status report on or before May 6, 2019 regarding the status of the bankruptcy proceedings and to provide notice to the Court if the bankruptcy proceedings conclude before May 6, 2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY FILING AND IMPOSITION OF AUTOMATIC STAY by Ditech Financial LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Chapter 11 Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Limited Stay Modification Order)(Stromquist, Matthew)
February 6, 2019 Filing 10 ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT Exhibit 1 by Ditech Financial LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . (Stromquist, Matthew)
February 6, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Ditech Financial LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association.(Stromquist, Matthew)
January 15, 2019 Filing 8 SLG TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (UNOPPOSED) Ditech Financial LLC answer due 2/6/2019; Federal National Mortgage Association answer due 2/6/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
January 14, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Ditech Financial LLC (Stromquist, Matthew)
January 14, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (UNOPPOSED) by Ditech Financial LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Stromquist, Matthew)
January 11, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE re #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew O. Stromquist, at docket #4 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (CME, COURT STAFF)
January 11, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Matthew O. Stromquist. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2634474.) by Ditech Financial LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association.(Stromquist, Matthew)
January 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 9, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Campion, Clinton)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ditech Financial LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association from Superior Court for the State of Alaska, Third Judicial District at Anchorage, case number 3AN-17-09340 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2633211), filed by Ditech Financial LLC, Federal National Mortgage Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Campion, Clinton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dalby v. Ditech Financial LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John S. Dalby
Represented By: James J. Davis, Jr.
Represented By: Nicholas Clark Feronti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal National Mortgage Association
Represented By: Clinton Matthew Campion
Represented By: Matthew O'Hair Stromquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ditech Financial LLC
Represented By: Clinton Matthew Campion
Represented By: Matthew O'Hair Stromquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?