Wilson v. Johnson

Petitioner: Sherrie I. Wilson
Respondent: Gloria Johnson
Case Number: 3:2019cv00006
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
0 Judge: Ralph R Beistline
1 Judge: James K Singleton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 2/22/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Petition, at docket #1 , is DISMISSED without prejudice. All pending motions are denied as moot. A Certificate of Appealability will not issue. Signed by Judge James K. Singleton, Jr on 2/21/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 30, 2019 Filing 4 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Sherrie I. Wilson. (PXS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 1/31/2019 to create relationship to document #3 (PXS, COURT STAFF).
January 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Sherrie I. Wilson.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 28, 2019 Filing 2 JUDGE BEISTLINE TEXT ORDER: By agreement of the Judges, the above referenced case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable James K. Singleton Jr. for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:19-cv-00006-JKS. (JLH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 1/28/2019 to clarify docket text (JLH, COURT STAFF).
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus 28:2254 (Filing fee $5/receipt #ANC015332), filed by Sherrie I. Wilson.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gloria Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sherrie I. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?