Frenzel v. Cash America Central Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Season Frenzel
Defendant: Cash America Central Inc., Cash America West, Inc., Cash America, Inc. of Alaska and FristCash, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00009
Filed: January 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of by Cash America Central Inc., Cash America West, Inc., Cash America, Inc. of Alaska, FristCash, Inc. #14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Cash America West, Inc., Cash America Central Inc., Cash America, Inc. of Alaska, FristCash, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Campion, Clinton)
March 8, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Cash America Central Inc., Cash America West, Inc., Cash America, Inc. of Alaska, FristCash, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Campion, Clinton)
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Matthew Campion on behalf of Cash America Central Inc., Cash America West, Inc., Cash America, Inc. of Alaska, FristCash, Inc. (Campion, Clinton)
February 22, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Season Frenzel. Cash America, Inc. of Alaska served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Tracking Information for Service Envelope to Cash America Inc, of Alaska, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Service Envelope addressed to Cash America Inc., of Alaska via Reg. Agent)(Bailey, Laura)
February 22, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Season Frenzel. FristCash, Inc. served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Green Card to FirstCash, Inc.)(Bailey, Laura)
February 22, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Season Frenzel. Cash America West, Inc. served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - USPS Tracking Information for Service Envelope to Cash America West, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - Service Envelope)(Bailey, Laura)
February 22, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Season Frenzel. Cash America Central Inc. served on 2/15/2019, answer due 3/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - Green Card to Cash America Central, Inc.)(Bailey, Laura)
February 12, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT on Service of Process by Season Frenzel. (Bailey, Laura)
February 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re Notice to Counsel. Plaintiff shall either file proofs of service by 7 days from the entry of this order or file a status report concerning service of the complaint on defendants. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 1/29/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Laura Ann E. Bailey. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2639868.) by Season Frenzel. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Bailey, Laura)
January 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to Cash America Central Inc., Cash America West, Inc., Cash America, Inc. of Alaska, FristCash, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Cash America Central Inc., (Attachments: #1 FristCash, Inc., #2 Cash America, Inc. of Alaska, #3 Cash America West, Inc.)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 16, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Bailey, Laura)
January 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cash America Central Inc., Cash America West, Inc., Cash America, Inc. of Alaska, FristCash, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2637500.), filed by Season Frenzel.(Bailey, Laura)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frenzel v. Cash America Central Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cash America Central Inc.
Represented By: Clinton Matthew Campion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cash America West, Inc.
Represented By: Clinton Matthew Campion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cash America, Inc. of Alaska
Represented By: Clinton Matthew Campion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FristCash, Inc.
Represented By: Clinton Matthew Campion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Season Frenzel
Represented By: Laura Ann E. Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?