United States of America v. Stewart
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Jack Spencer Stewart
Case Number: 3:2019cv00010
Filed: January 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33:1365
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2019 Filing 14 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the Notice at Docket #13 filed by Jack Spencer Stewart. Parties to file a Status Report due by 12/2/2019, or within 7 days of the termination of the bankruptcy proceedings. (CME, COURT STAFF)
May 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY IN BANKRUPTCY (CHAPTER 7) by Jack Spencer Stewart (Jacobus, Kenneth)
May 13, 2019 Filing 12 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF) Modified on 5/15/2019 to disregard docket entry. Document have been filed in the correct case. (PXS, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 5/8/19. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Quinn, Vickey)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the United States' Status Report filed at Docket #8 . Based on that review, IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file a proposed Planning and Scheduling Report, with or without Defendant's consent, as the case may be, by May 8, 2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
April 30, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT Re: Joint Scheduling and Planning Conference Report by United States of America. (Quinn, Vickey)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 04/09/2019. (Attachments: # 1 Form) (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
March 18, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth P. Jacobus on behalf of Jack Spencer Stewart (Jacobus, Kenneth)
March 6, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint, Summons Issued, #4 Notice (Other), #2 Civil Cover Sheet (Quinn, Vickey)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 IMPORTANT REMINDER: Proof of service as to one or more defendants is lacking. Pursuant to Rule 4(m), Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, service is to be accomplished within 90 days from the filing of the complaint. File proofs of service on those defendants already served. (CME, COURT STAFF)
January 17, 2019 Summons Issued as to Jack Spencer Stewart. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 17, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Jack Spencer Stewart. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 17, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
January 17, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Jack Spencer Stewart, filed by United States of America.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jack Spencer Stewart
Represented By: Kenneth P. Jacobus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Vickey L. Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?