Quintillion Networks, LLC v. Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company

Plaintiff: Quintillion Networks, LLC
Defendant: Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv00042
Filed: February 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 8, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (Jamieson, Brewster)
April 8, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (Jamieson, Brewster)
April 8, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company.(Jamieson, Brewster)
April 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Bruce Baylous on behalf of Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company (Baylous, Michael)
April 8, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brewster H. Jamieson on behalf of Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company (Jamieson, Brewster)
March 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE Of Withdrawal Of Tali Kindred As Counsel For Plaintiff by Quintillion Networks, LLC (Katchen, Jonathan)
February 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 2/26/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 15, 2019 Summons Issued as to Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
February 14, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
February 14, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Kindred, Talitha)
February 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT And Demand For Jury Trial against Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2650916.), filed by Quintillion Networks, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Kindred, Talitha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Quintillion Networks, LLC v. Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Brewster H. Jamieson
Represented By: Michael Bruce Baylous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quintillion Networks, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan W. Katchen
Represented By: Talitha Birch Kindred
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?