WT AK Ventures LLC et al v. KC Kregar

Plaintiff: Tyler Caskey and WT AK Ventures LLC
Defendant: KC Kregar
Case Number: 3:2019cv00047
Filed: February 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTICE re #13 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Sandra Lynn Weiherer, at docket #13 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 18, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Sandra Weiherer. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2685423.) by Tyler Caskey, WT AK Ventures LLC.(Petumenos, Timothy)
April 18, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Will Skinner. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2685408.) by Tyler Caskey, WT AK Ventures LLC.(Petumenos, Timothy)
April 12, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 11, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by All Defendants.(George, David)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re Extension of Time. Defendants appearance and answer to the complaint are now due 4/8/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 25, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by Tyler Caskey, WT AK Ventures LLC. (Petumenos, Timothy)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re Status of Defendant. Plaintiff to call upon defendant to respond to the complaint forthwith, or apply to the clerk of court for entry of default, or file a brief case status report on or before seven days from the entry of this order. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 3/25/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 21, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Tyler Caskey, WT AK Ventures LLC re Summons Issued (Petumenos, Timothy)
March 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re Notice to Counsel. Plaintiff shall either file proof of service by seven days from the entry of this order or file a status report concerning service of the complaint on defendant. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 3/5/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
February 21, 2019 Summons Issued as to KC Kregar. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 21, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant KC Kregar. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 20, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Petumenos, Timothy)
February 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against KC Kregar ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2653302.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Petumenos, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WT AK Ventures LLC et al v. KC Kregar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyler Caskey
Represented By: Timothy J. Petumenos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WT AK Ventures LLC
Represented By: Timothy J. Petumenos
Represented By: Sandra Lynn Weiherer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KC Kregar
Represented By: David E. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?