Stoltenberg v. United States of America
Petitioner: Edwin Allen Stoltenberg
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00053
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER denying #7 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 4/15/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 28, 2019 Filing 8 SWORN AFFIDAVIT re #7 MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edwin Allen Stoltenberg. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 28, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Reconsideration re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edwin Allen Stoltenberg.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 20, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 3/20/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING PETITION: The Petition at docket #1 is DISMISSED with prejudice. All pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. A certificate of appealability shall not issue. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 3/19/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 18, 2019 Filing 4 SWORN AFFIDAVIT Submit Evidence On/For Record by Edwin Allen Stoltenberg. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 SWORN AFFIDAVIT Submit Evidence Into Record by Edwin Allen Stoltenberg. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Edwin Allen Stoltenberg. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (28:2241), filed by Edwin Allen Stoltenberg.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stoltenberg v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edwin Allen Stoltenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?