Native Village of Nuiqsut et al v. Bureau of Land Management et al

Plaintiff: Friends of the Earth, Alaska Wilderness League, Native Village of Nuiqsut, Sierra Club, Natural Resources Defense Council and Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management, Nichelle Jones, David Bernhardt and Ted Murphy
Intervenor Defendant: ConocoPhillips Alaska, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00056
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 42:4332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Bryn Resser Pallesen on behalf of ConocoPhillips Alaska, Inc. (Pallesen, Bryn)
April 22, 2019 Filing 22 CLERK'S NOTICE re #20 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Garett Robert Rose, at docket #20 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (CME, COURT STAFF)
April 22, 2019 Filing 21 SLG TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion for Leave to File Thumb Drives is GRANTED. Federal Defendants to file the administrative record by hand delivering two copies on thumb drive to the Clerk's Office, on or before May 1, 2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
April 19, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Garett Robert Rose. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2686904.) by Natural Resources Defense Council.(Rose, Garett)
April 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason T Morgan on behalf of ConocoPhillips Alaska, Inc. (Morgan, Jason)
April 19, 2019 Filing 18 Consent MOTION for Leave to File two thumb drives containing administrative record and hyperlinked index by David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management, Nichelle Jones, Ted Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Most, John)
April 12, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, by ConocoPhillips Alaska, Inc..(Steen, Ryan)
April 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Joint Scheduling Motion. See Order text for deadlines. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 4/12/19. (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Intervene. ConocoPhillips is admitted into this litigation as an intervenor-defendant. ConocoPhillips is hereby directed to file its Answer. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 4/10/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 8, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION for Case Management Schedule by Alaska Wilderness League, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, Native Village of Nuiqsut, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Noblin, Rebecca)
April 8, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE to Motion (Non-Opposition) re #7 MOTION to Intervene filed by Alaska Wilderness League, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, Native Village of Nuiqsut, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club. (Noblin, Rebecca)
April 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by John S. Most on behalf of David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management, Nichelle Jones, Ted Murphy (Most, John)
March 27, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ConocoPhillips Alaska, Inc.. (Steen, Ryan)
March 27, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Ryan P. Steen re #7 MOTION to Intervene , #8 Memorandum by ConocoPhillips Alaska, Inc.. (Steen, Ryan)
March 27, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Lorna K. Richmond re #7 MOTION to Intervene , #8 Memorandum by ConocoPhillips Alaska, Inc.. (Steen, Ryan)
March 27, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion to Intervene by ConocoPhillips Alaska, Inc. #7 MOTION to Intervene filed by ConocoPhillips Alaska, Inc.. (Steen, Ryan)
March 27, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Intervene by ConocoPhillips Alaska, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Answer, #2 Proposed Order)(Steen, Ryan)
March 26, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint; Plaintiffs' Rule 7.1 Statement served on Bureau of Land Management; David Bernhardt; Ted Murphy; Nichelle Jones; William Barr; and Civil Process Clerk on March 4, 2019, filed by Alaska Wilderness League, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, Native Village of Nuiqsut, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Noblin, Rebecca)
March 26, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management, Nichelle Jones, Ted Murphy, filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Alaska Wilderness League, Native Village of Nuiqsut, Friends of the Earth, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club.(Noblin, Rebecca)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alaska Wilderness League, Center for Biological Diversity, Friends of the Earth, Native Village of Nuiqsut, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club. (Noblin, Rebecca)
March 1, 2019 Summons Issued as to David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management, Nichelle Jones, Ted Murphy, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 1, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Bureau of Land Management, (Attachments: #1 David Bernhardt, #2 Ted Murphy, #3 Nichelle Jones, #4 U.S. Attorney General, #5 U.S. Attorney)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Noblin, Rebecca)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against David Bernhardt, Bureau of Land Management, Nichelle Jones, Ted Murphy ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2658128.), filed by Center for Biological Diversity, Alaska Wilderness League, Native Village of Nuiqsut, Friends of the Earth, Natural Resources Defense Council, Sierra Club.(Noblin, Rebecca)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Native Village of Nuiqsut et al v. Bureau of Land Management et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Friends of the Earth
Represented By: Jeremy C. Lieb
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Represented By: Rebecca Noblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Wilderness League
Represented By: Jeremy C. Lieb
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Represented By: Rebecca Noblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Native Village of Nuiqsut
Represented By: Jeremy C. Lieb
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Represented By: Rebecca Noblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Club
Represented By: Jeremy C. Lieb
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Represented By: Rebecca Noblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Natural Resources Defense Council
Represented By: Jeremy C. Lieb
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Represented By: Rebecca Noblin
Represented By: Garett Robert Rose
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Jeremy C. Lieb
Represented By: Eric P. Jorgensen
Represented By: Rebecca Noblin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: John S. Most
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nichelle Jones
Represented By: John S. Most
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Bernhardt
Represented By: John S. Most
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Murphy
Represented By: John S. Most
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: ConocoPhillips Alaska, Inc.
Represented By: Bryn Resser Pallesen
Represented By: Jason T Morgan
Represented By: Ryan P. Steen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?