Allstate Insurance Company v. Estate of Maia Grace Elizabeth Walker et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Kelly Colleen McGann, Jeffery Walker and Estate of Maia Grace Elizabeth Walker
Case Number: 3:2019cv00063
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Clayton, Alfred)
April 1, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company. (Clayton, Alfred)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE Re Service on Defendants by Allstate Insurance Company re #4 Order (Clayton, Alfred)
March 28, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss by Estate of Maia Grace Elizabeth Walker, Kelly Colleen McGann, Jeffery Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Vance, Jeffrey)
March 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re Notice to Counsel. Plaintiff shall either file proofs of service within 7 days from the entry of this order or file a status report concerning service of the complaint on defendants. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 6, 2019 Summons Issued as to Estate of Maia Grace Elizabeth Walker, Kelly Colleen McGann, Jeffery Walker. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Estate of Maia Grace Elizabeth Walker, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant McGann, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Walker)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Clayton, Alfred)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Estate of Maia Grace Elizabeth Walker, Kelly Colleen McGann, Jeffery Walker ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2661088.), filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Clayton, Alfred) Modified on 3/6/2019 to correct party names (PXS, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Estate of Maia Grace Elizabeth Walker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly Colleen McGann
Represented By: Jeffrey Hilden Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Walker
Represented By: Jeffrey Hilden Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Maia Grace Elizabeth Walker
Represented By: Jeffrey Hilden Vance
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Alfred T. Clayton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?