Kuse v. Providence Health & Services et al

Plaintiff: Tony Kuse
Defendant: ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, Providence Health & Services, Gregory Paul Schweiger and Ortho Alaska LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00080
Filed: March 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION of Dismissal without prejudice by Tony Kuse. (Twomey, Timothy)
June 12, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE Of Request to Be Removed from CM/ECF Electronic Service List by ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust (Wang, Thomas)
June 10, 2019 Filing 22 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 6, 2019 Filing 21 ERRATA Exhibit 1 by Providence Health & Services #18 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Providence Health & Services. (Marisseau, Medora)
June 6, 2019 Filing 20 ADDITIONAL RELATED DOCUMENT , Order of Dismissal With Prejudice and Without Costs [Proposed] by Providence Health & Services re #18 MOTION to Dismiss . (Marisseau, Medora)
June 6, 2019 Filing 19 DECLARATION of Medora A. Marisseau re #18 MOTION to Dismiss by Providence Health & Services. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Marisseau, Medora)
June 6, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Dismiss by Providence Health & Services.(Marisseau, Medora)
June 4, 2019 Filing 17 JWS TEXT ORDER re #16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #1 Complaint. Pursuant to Defendant Providence Health & Services Unopposed Motion for an extension of time to file its Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint, to June 6, 2019, the motion is hereby GRANTED. Providence Health & Services shall file its Responsive Pleading on or before Thursday, June 6, 2019. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
May 30, 2019 Filing 16 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 12 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer , Unopposed, and Proposed Order by Providence Health & Services.(Marisseau, Medora)
May 30, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by Ortho Alaska LLC.(Meyers, Donna)
May 28, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant ASEA by Tony Kuse (Twomey, Timothy)
May 21, 2019 Filing 13 JWS TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust's answer due 5/31/2019. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
May 21, 2019 Filing 12 JWS TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Providence Health & Services' answer due 5/31/2019. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
May 20, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed by ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wang, Thomas)
May 17, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer UNOPPOSED by Providence Health & Services. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Marisseau, Medora)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. Defendants Ortho Alaska, LLC and Gregory Paul Schweiger, M.D. answer due on or before 5/30/19. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 5/17/19. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
May 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, Unopposed by Ortho Alaska LLC, Gregory Paul Schweiger. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Meyers, Donna)
May 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Joseph Lamb on behalf of Gregory Paul Schweiger (Lamb, Timothy)
May 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Donna M. Meyers on behalf of Ortho Alaska LLC, Gregory Paul Schweiger (Meyers, Donna)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Medora A. Marisseau on behalf of Providence Health & Services (Marisseau, Medora)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas V. Wang, Jr on behalf of ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust (Wang, Thomas)
March 26, 2019 Summons Issued as to ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, Ortho Alaska LLC, Providence Health & Services, Gregory Paul Schweiger. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 26, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Providence Health & Services, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Gregory Paul Schweiger, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant Ortho Alaska LLC)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 26, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2670973.), filed by Tony Kuse. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Twomey, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kuse v. Providence Health & Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ASEA/AFSCME Local 52 Health Benefits Trust
Represented By: Thomas V. Wang, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Providence Health & Services
Represented By: Medora A. Marisseau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory Paul Schweiger
Represented By: Donna M. Meyers
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Lamb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho Alaska LLC
Represented By: Donna M. Meyers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tony Kuse
Represented By: Timothy M. Twomey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?