Plumb v. Financial Collection Agency of Anchorage, Inc.

Plaintiff: Joshua Plumb
Defendant: Financial Collection Agency of Anchorage, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00084
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joshua Plumb. Financial Collection Agency of Anchorage, Inc. served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. (Barshay, David)
April 23, 2019 Summons Issued as to Financial Collection Agency of Anchorage, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 23, 2019 Filing 8 Unissued summons re Defendant Financial Collection Agency of Anchorage, Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 4/10/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 1, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE re #3 and #5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David Michael Barshay, at dockets #3 and #5 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney David Michael Barshay. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2674192.) by Joshua Plumb.(Barshay, David)
March 31, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of David Michael Barshay re #3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney David Michael Barshay by Joshua Plumb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barshay, David)
March 31, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney David Michael Barshay by Joshua Plumb.(Barshay, David)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Financial Collection Agency of Anchorage, Inc. (Filing fee $400/Receipt #ANC015573.), filed by Joshua Plumb.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Plumb v. Financial Collection Agency of Anchorage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Financial Collection Agency of Anchorage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Plumb
Represented By: William D. Cook
Represented By: David Michael Barshay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?