Platt v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Johnathan Platt
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 3:2019cv00086
Filed: March 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE re #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by April L. Strang-Kutay, at docket #4 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 Receipt of 150 non-resident attorney payment for April L. Strang-Kutay as to Plaintiff Johnathan Platt. re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney April L. Strang-Kutay (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 27, 2019 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Johnathan Platt (Cook, William)
May 24, 2019 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Unissued summons re Defendant United States of America. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney April L. Strang-Kutay by Johnathan Platt.(Cook, William)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 4/9/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
March 28, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $400/Receipt #ANC015575.), filed by Johnathan Platt.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Platt v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Johnathan Platt
Represented By: William D. Cook
Represented By: April L. Strang-Kutay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?