Spencer v. Crum et al

Plaintiff: Jennifer Spencer
Defendant: Shawnda O'Brien and Adam Crum
Case Number: 3:2019cv00087
Filed: March 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 26 SLG TEXT ORDER: Defendants' Fifth Motion for an Extension of Time (Docket #25 ) is GRANTED as follows: Case closing documents or another status report to be filed on or before August 9, 2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
July 5, 2019 Filing 25 Fifth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed by Adam Crum, Shawnda O'Brien. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Fifth Order Granting Extension)(Hildebrand, Alexander)
June 17, 2019 Filing 24 SLG TEXT ORDER re #23 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed as to #5 MOTION to Certify Class fled by Adam Crum is GRANTED. Response due by 7/5/2019. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 13, 2019 Filing 23 Fourth MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 MOTION to Certify Class Unopposed by Adam Crum, Shawnda O'Brien. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Fourth Order Granting Extension)(Hildebrand, Alexander)
May 31, 2019 Filing 22 SLG TEXT ORDER: re #21 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed filed by Adam Crum is GRANTED. Responses due by 6/14/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
May 30, 2019 Filing 21 Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed by Adam Crum. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Third Order Granting Extension)(Hildebrand, Alexander)
May 10, 2019 Filing 20 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Extension at Docket #18 is GRANTED. Defendant's Opposition to the motion for class certification, at docket #5 due by May 31, 2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
May 10, 2019 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT RE: SETTLEMENT NEGOTIATIONS by Jennifer Spencer. (Dudukgian, Goriune)
May 9, 2019 Filing 18 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Unopposed by Adam Crum. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hildebrand, Alexander)
April 16, 2019 Filing 17 Notice to Counsel re #15 Notice (Other),, filed by Shawnda O'Brien, Adam Crum. A review of the document submitted at dkt 15 confirms that it is over 25 pages in length. If a CHAMBERS copy of the document has not been forwarded to the Court, counsel is reminded that, pursuant to D.Ak.LR 10.1(b) and the Administrative Policies and Procedures, you are required to provide the court with a CHAMBERS copy of your filing at dkt 15. The CHAMBERS copy must be attached to a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing and must be printed with the ECF pdf footer on each page. (CME, COURT STAFF)
April 16, 2019 Filing 16 SLG TEXT ORDER: re #14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File is GRANTED. Response to Motion to Certify Class at Docket #5 due by 5/10/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
April 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF DOCUMENTS FILED IN SUPERIOR COURT by Adam Crum, Shawnda O'Brien re #4 Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Class Action Complaint, #3 Motion For Class Certification, #4 Affidavit Affidavit, #5 Affidavit Affidavit, #6 Memorandum, #7 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #8 Entry Of Appearance, #9 Notice Of Removal from State Court to Federal Court)(Hildebrand, Alexander) Modified on 4/16/2019 to clarify attachment 9. (BJK, COURT STAFF).
April 15, 2019 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Unopposed motion for extension by Adam Crum, Shawnda O'Brien. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hildebrand, Alexander)
April 12, 2019 Filing 13 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Court has reviewed the parties' Notice filed at Docket #12 . Based on that review, IT IS ORDERED that the parties file either (1) the Initial Scheduling and Planning Conference Report, or (2) a Status Report, on or before May 10, 2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
April 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Settlement Negotiations by Jennifer Spencer (Dudukgian, Goriune)
April 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by All Defendants (Hildebrand, Alexander)
April 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 04/09/2019. (Attachments: #1 Form)(CME, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2019 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by All Defendants.(Hildebrand, Alexander)
March 31, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Jennifer Spencer re #5 MOTION to Certify Class by Jennifer Spencer. (Dudukgian, Goriune)
March 31, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Goriune Dudukgian re #5 MOTION to Certify Class by Jennifer Spencer. (Dudukgian, Goriune)
March 31, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support of Motion for Class Certification by Jennifer Spencer #5 MOTION to Certify Class filed by Jennifer Spencer. (Dudukgian, Goriune)
March 31, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Certify Class by Jennifer Spencer. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Class Certification)(Dudukgian, Goriune)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander J. Hildebrand on behalf of All Defendants (Hildebrand, Alexander)
March 29, 2019 Filing fee: $400, receipt number ANC015577 (PXS, COURT STAFF)
March 29, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Hildebrand, Alexander)
March 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Anchorage Superior Court, case number 3AN-19-05386CI. ( Filing fee $ 400), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Motion for Class Certification, Etc.)(Hildebrand, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spencer v. Crum et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawnda O'Brien
Represented By: Alexander J. Hildebrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Crum
Represented By: Alexander J. Hildebrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Spencer
Represented By: Goriune Dudukgian
Represented By: James J. Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?