Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Best
Plaintiff: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Paige Best
Case Number: 3:2019cv00093
Filed: April 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 FINAL JUDGMENT. The #4 Stipulation is accepted. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 6/13/2019. (NMG, CHAMBERS STAFF)
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Entry of Final Judgment Declaring the Insurance Claims of Paige Best Invalid by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clayton, Alfred)
April 5, 2019 Summons Issued as to Paige Best. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Paige Best. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 4, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Clayton, Alfred)
April 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Paige Best ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2677393.), filed by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Clayton, Alfred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Alfred T. Clayton, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paige Best
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?