Rogers v. The Estate of Joe C. Ashlock
Plaintiff: David Allen Rogers
Defendant: The Estate of Joe C. Ashlock
Case Number: 3:2019cv00096
Filed: April 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:688
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 15 SLG TEXT ORDER: The second motion for extension of time to answer (Docket #12 ) is GRANTED, and the answer filed on July 3, 2019 at Docket #14 is accepted as timely filed. (CME, COURT STAFF)
July 3, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The Estate of Joe C. Ashlock.(Hozubin, Rebecca)
June 24, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of COUNSEL re #12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The Estate of Joe C. Ashlock. (Hozubin, Rebecca)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by The Estate of Joe C. Ashlock. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hozubin, Rebecca)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Discovery due by 6/10/2020. (See PDF for details) Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 6/17/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer The Estate of Joe C. Ashlock answer due 6/21/2019. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 6/17/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hozubin, Rebecca)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by The Estate of Joe C. Ashlock. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hozubin, Rebecca)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE REPORT: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 5/23/19. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling and Planning Conference Report)(JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by The Estate of Joe C. Ashlock. (Hozubin, Rebecca)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Rebecca J. Hozubin on behalf of The Estate of Joe C. Ashlock (Hozubin, Rebecca)
April 5, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by David Allen Rogers. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2019 Summons Issued as to The Estate of Joe C. Ashlock. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant The Estate of Joe C. Ashlock. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Estate of Joe C. Ashlock, filed by David Allen Rogers.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rogers v. The Estate of Joe C. Ashlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Allen Rogers
Represented By: Bruce F. Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Estate of Joe C. Ashlock
Represented By: Rebecca J. Hozubin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?