Ekstrom v. Woods
Plaintiff: Peter Ekstrom
Defendant: Frank G. Woods, III
Case Number: 3:2019cv00098
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: Deborah M Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Frank Woods III on 06/21/2019, filed by Peter Ekstrom. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Manning, Mark)
May 24, 2019 Summons Reissued as to Frank G. Woods, III. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 Unissued summons re Defendant Frank G. Woods III. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: The above referenced case is referred to Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Smith for disposition or findings and recommendations as appropriate pursuant to D.Ak.LMR 4(2) Matter relating to nonpayment t of seaman's wages. (CME, COURT STAFF)
April 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to Frank G. Woods, III. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 9, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Frank G. Woods, III. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 9, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Frank G. Woods, III, filed by Peter Ekstrom.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ekstrom v. Woods
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Ekstrom
Represented By: Mark C. Manning
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank G. Woods, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?