Lietzke v. City of Birmingham et al
Plaintiff: Bill Lietzke
Defendant: Patrick D. Smith and City of Birmingham
Case Number: 3:2019cv00104
Filed: April 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Timothy M Burgess
Referring Judge: Matthew McCrary Scoble
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGMENT case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 6/11/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF DISMISSAL; denied as moot #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Case is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Timothy M. Burgess on 6/11/19. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 TMB TEXT ORDER: The Clerk of Court will change the Nature of Suit in this case from 320 to 440 correctly identify the case as a Civil Rights case. This action is administrative in nature only. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
May 6, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE : This matter is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Timothy M. Burgess. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:19-cv-00104-TMB. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
April 12, 2019 Notice of Assignment to a US Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent form. Please Note: Forms must NOT be electronically filed with the Court. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 5/3/2019. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 12, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant City of Birmingham, (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 12, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bill Lietzke.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 12, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City of Birmingham, Patrick D. Smith, filed by Bill Lietzke.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lietzke v. City of Birmingham et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Birmingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bill Lietzke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?