Mulligan v. AWAIC Shelter
Plaintiff: Anne Patricia Mulligan
Defendant: AWAIC Shelter
Case Number: 3:2019cv00114
Filed: April 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Referring Judge: Deborah M Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 6/18/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: This case is DISMISSED. All outstanding motion are DENIED. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 6/17/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 12, 2019 Filing 7 SLG TEXT ORDER: By agreement of the judges the above case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Ralph R. Beistline for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number for all future filings: 3:19-cv-00114-RRB. (CME, COURT STAFF) (CME, COURT STAFF)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE: This matter is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Sharon L. Gleason. Please use 3:19-cv-00114-SLG on all future filings. (BJK, COURT STAFF) Modified on 5/8/2019 to clarify notice not order. (BJK, COURT STAFF).
April 17, 2019 Notice of Assignment to a US Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent form. Please Note: Forms must NOT be electronically filed with the Court. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 5/8/2019. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 17, 2019 Filing 5 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT - CJA 23 by Anne Patricia Mulligan. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Open/New Case by Anne Patricia Mulligan.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anne Patricia Mulligan.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 17, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AWAIC Shelter, filed by Anne Patricia Mulligan.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mulligan v. AWAIC Shelter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AWAIC Shelter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anne Patricia Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?