Simeonoff v. Trosvig et al
Plaintiff: Frederick Simeonoff
Defendant: Grayling, LLC, Nordic Cross, LLC, F/V NORDIC CROSS, O.N. 600298 and Christian Trosvig
Case Number: 3:2019cv00115
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: Deborah M Smith
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Quash Warrant in rem. Arrest warrant issued on 05/10/2019 for F/V Nordic Cross is hereby QUASHED. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 5/17/2019. (JBO, CHAMBERS STAFF)
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Quash warrant in rem - Unopposed by Frederick Simeonoff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williams, Douglas)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Appoint Custodian. Emerald Isle Marine Services, LLC appointed. Plaintiffs are directed to serve the Motion for a Substitute Custodian and the Courts Orders Arresting the Vessel and Appointing a Substitute Custodian upon all interested parties by May 27, 2019. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 5/10/2019. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
May 10, 2019 IN REM WARRANT of ARREST issued as to F/V NORDIC CROSS, O.N. 600298. cc: orig =1 certified copy to USM. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
May 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Issuance of Arrest Warrant in rem for vessel F/V Nordic Cross, O.N. 600298. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 5/10/2019. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF)
April 25, 2019 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE re #8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Douglas R. Williams, at docket #8 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (CME, COURT STAFF)
April 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Douglas R. Williams. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2689266.) by Frederick Simeonoff.(Williams, Douglas)
April 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Smith for disposition or findings and recommendations as appropriate pursuant to D.Ak.LMR 4(5). (CME, COURT STAFF)
April 18, 2019 Filing 6 DECLARATION of Mark Keplinger re #5 MOTION to Appoint Custodian (Substitute) by Frederick Simeonoff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Neidzwski, Nicholas)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appoint Custodian (Substitute) by Frederick Simeonoff. (Attachments: #1 Propsed Order)(Neidzwski, Nicholas)
April 18, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem and Memorandum for Order Authorizing Clerk to Issue of Warrant for Arrest in Rem by Frederick Simeonoff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Warrant of Arrest)(Neidzwski, Nicholas)
April 18, 2019 Summons Issued as to Grayling, LLC, Nordic Cross, LLC, Christian Trosvig. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 18, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Christian Trosvig, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Nordic Cross, LLC, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Grayling, LLC, #3 Unissued Summons re Defendant F/V NORDIC CROSS, O.N. 600298)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 SEAMAN'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT against F/V NORDIC CROSS, O.N. 600298, Grayling, LLC, Nordic Cross, LLC, Christian Trosvig, filed by Frederick Simeonoff.(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simeonoff v. Trosvig et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grayling, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nordic Cross, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F/V NORDIC CROSS, O.N. 600298
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christian Trosvig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Simeonoff
Represented By: Douglas Ralph Williams
Represented By: Nicholas John Neidzwski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?