Archibald et al v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gregory K. Archibald and Terri Archibald
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. and Zimmer, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00116
Filed: April 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2019 Filing 12 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-14): Pursuant to Rule 7. I of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of New York for the reasons stated in the order of October 3, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Paul A. Crotty. (CME, COURT STAFF)
May 1, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc.. (Baxter, Lee)
May 1, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Documents from Superior Court by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. (Baxter, Lee)
May 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. (Baxter, Lee)
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: Motion to Stay Proceedings at Docket #7 is GRANTED. (See Order for details).. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 04/26/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
April 25, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Stay Proceedings and Answer Deadline Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (Unopposed) by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proposed Order)(Baxter, Lee)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE: Based upon random reassignment, this action is reassigned to the Honorable Sharon L. Gleason for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:19-cv-00116-SLG. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL: The assigned judge recuses from presiding in this case. The Clerk will please assign this case by random draw to another judge in this district. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
April 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Removal to Adverse Party by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Baxter, Lee)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 18, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc., Zimmer, Inc. from Superior Court for the State of Alaska, Third Judicial District of Anchorage, case number 3AN-19-05877 CI. ( Filing fee $400/Receipt #ANC015670), filed by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc., Zimmer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint, #2 Exhibit B Pleadings and Process Served, #3 Exhibit C Zimmer Inc. Indiana Business Entity Report, #4 Exhibit D Zimmer Biomet Holdings Indiana Business Entity Report, #5 Exhibit E Zimmer US Inc Indiana Business Entity Report)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Archibald et al v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory K. Archibald
Represented By: Peter A. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terri Archibald
Represented By: Peter A. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Singer
Represented By: Lee Colin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Singer
Represented By: Lee Colin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Singer
Represented By: Lee Colin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?