Edelen v. Sturgeon Electric, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: William Edelen
Defendant: Sturgeon Electric, Inc., Casey Vandor and David Kezer
Case Number: 3:2019cv00125
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE re #16 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Danielle S. Urban, at docket #16 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 21, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Danielle S. Urban. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2718565.) by Sturgeon Electric, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Morisset, Catharine)
June 21, 2019 Filing 15 Initial Disclosure by William Edelen Preliminary Witness List by William Edelen.(Brattain, William)
June 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE Confirming All State Records Submitted and Service List by Sturgeon Electric, Inc. re #11 Order (Morisset, Catharine)
May 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/18/2020. Motions due by 8/16/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2019. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 05/30/2019. (CME, COURT STAFF)
May 28, 2019 Filing 12 STATUS REPORT / Case Scheduling & Planning by Sturgeon Electric, Inc.. (Morisset, Catharine)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER re #6 Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 5/14/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 7, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 3, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant Sturgeon Electric's ANSWER to Complaint by Sturgeon Electric, Inc..(Morisset, Catharine)
May 3, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sturgeon Electric, Inc.. (Morisset, Catharine)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
April 30, 2019 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Casey Vandor re #1 Notice of Removal, by Sturgeon Electric, Inc.. (Morisset, Catharine)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 DECLARATION of David Kezer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Sturgeon Electric, Inc.. (Morisset, Catharine)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 DECLARATION of Mindie McIff re #1 Notice of Removal, by Sturgeon Electric, Inc.. (Morisset, Catharine)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Morisset, Catharine)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sturgeon Electric, Inc. from Superior Court of the State of Alaska Third Judicial District at Anchorage, case number 1905642CJ. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2692063), filed by Sturgeon Electric, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Exhibit Superior Court Notice of Removal)(Morisset, Catharine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edelen v. Sturgeon Electric, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sturgeon Electric, Inc.
Represented By: Catharine M. Morisset
Represented By: Danielle S. Urban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Casey Vandor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kezer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Edelen
Represented By: William F. Brattain, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?