Tucker v. General Communications, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Tucker
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America, General Communications, Inc. and General Communications Long Term Disability Plan
Case Number: 3:2019cv00133
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2019 Filing 6 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer, at docket #5 , is hereby GRANTED. Prudential Insurance Company of America answer shall be due 7/15/2019. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 21, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, for All Defendants Unopposed by Prudential Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Partnow, Peter)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Peter C. Partnow on behalf of Prudential Insurance Company of America (Partnow, Peter)
May 8, 2019 Summons Issued as to General Communications Long Term Disability Plan, General Communications, Inc., Prudential Insurance Company of America. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant General Communications, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant General Communications Long Term Disability Plan, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Prudential Insurance Company of America)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Communications Long Term Disability Plan, General Communications, Inc., Prudential Insurance Company of America (Filing fee $400/receipt #ANC015738.), filed by Timothy Tucker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. General Communications, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prudential Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Peter C. Partnow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Communications, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Communications Long Term Disability Plan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Tucker
Represented By: Michael W. Flanigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?