Raymond James Trust, N.A. v. Husby et al
Plaintiff: Raymond James Trust, N.A.
Defendant: Husby Legacy Inc. and Vonna Kay Husby
Case Number: 3:2019cv00138
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Fact Discovery closes 5/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/24/2020. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 7/8/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 28, 2019 Filing 31 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cuddy, Kevin)
June 14, 2019 Filing 30 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 14, 2019 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Husby Legacy Inc..(Cole, Charles)
June 13, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Vonna Kay Husby.(Cole, Charles)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Unopposed motion to late-file and #24 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. answer due 6/14/2019. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 6, 2019 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Charles E. Cole re #25 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Extension of Time Unopposed, #24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by Vonna Kay Husby, Husby Legacy Inc.. (Cole, Charles)
June 6, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Extension of Time Unopposed by Vonna Kay Husby, Husby Legacy Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cole, Charles)
June 6, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by Vonna Kay Husby, Husby Legacy Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cole, Charles)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER approving #22 Stipulation re Assets; denying #5 motion for a preliminary injunction and motion for a writ of attachment. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 5/23/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION re Assets by Raymond James Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cuddy, Kevin)
May 21, 2019 Filing 21 DEFENDANT'S EXHIBIT LIST re #18 Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Writ of Attachment [DKT 5] held on 5/21/2019. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
May 21, 2019 Filing 20 PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBIT LIST re #18 Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Writ of Attachment [DKT 5] held on 5/21/2019. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
May 21, 2019 Filing 19 WITNESS LIST re #18 Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Writ of Attachment [DKT 5] held on 5/21/2019. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
May 21, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge H. Russel Holland: Hearing on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Writ of Attachment [DKT 5] held on 5/21/2019. Witness sworn. Exhibits identified. Court ordered parties to confer and file stipulation as to which accounts are to be frozen due by COB May 22, 2019. Court to rule on Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Writ of Attachment at Docket #5 after stipulation is filed. See attached PDF. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
May 20, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Motion Papers served on Vonna Kay Husby and Husby Legacy Inc. (Vonna Husby, Registered Agent) on 05/15/19, filed by Raymond James Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Cuddy, Kevin)
May 20, 2019 Filing 16 AFFIDAVIT of Kevin Cuddy re #11 MOTION to Expedite Motion for TRO, Writ of Attachment, and Preliminary Injunction (on Shortened Time), #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on Shortened Time by Raymond James Trust, N.A.. (Cuddy, Kevin)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Expedite Consideration. Plaintiff's motion for tempoary restraining order without notice is denied. A hearing on plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction and writ of attachment is set for May 21, 2019 at 9:00am in Anchorage Courtroom 4 before H. Russel Holland. In addition to effecting personal service of its complaint and motion papers, plaintiff shall immediately provide notice of this hearing to defendants. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 5/16/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Raymond James Trust, N.A.. (Cuddy, Kevin)
May 15, 2019 Filing 13 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Raymond James Trust, N.A.. (Cuddy, Kevin)
May 15, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Kevin Cuddy re #11 MOTION to Expedite Motion for TRO, Writ of Attachment, and Preliminary Injunction (on Shortened Time), #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on Shortened Time, #6 Memorandum by Raymond James Trust, N.A.. (Cuddy, Kevin)
May 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Expedite Motion for TRO, Writ of Attachment, and Preliminary Injunction (on Shortened Time) by Raymond James Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cuddy, Kevin)
May 15, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Jonathan Richie re #6 Memorandum, #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on Shortened Time by Raymond James Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Cuddy, Kevin)
May 15, 2019 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Richard Fairweather re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on Shortened Time, #6 Memorandum by Raymond James Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Cuddy, Kevin)
May 15, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Michael J. Cavaliere re #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on Shortened Time, #6 Memorandum by Raymond James Trust, N.A.. (Cuddy, Kevin)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Kim Reilly re #6 Memorandum, #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on Shortened Time by Raymond James Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Cuddy, Kevin)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM ISO Motion for TRO, Writ of Attachment, and Preliminary Injunction by Raymond James Trust, N.A. #5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on Shortened Time filed by Raymond James Trust, N.A.. (Cuddy, Kevin)
May 15, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order on Shortened Time by Raymond James Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Cuddy, Kevin)
May 15, 2019 Filing 4 Civil Cover Sheet. (Cuddy, Kevin)
May 15, 2019 Summons Issued as to Vonna Kay Husby, Husby Legacy Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Vonna Kay Husby, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Husby Legacy Inc.)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Vonna Kay Husby, Husby Legacy Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2700277.), filed by Raymond James Trust, N.A..(Cuddy, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Raymond James Trust, N.A. v. Husby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Husby Legacy Inc.
Represented By: Charles E. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vonna Kay Husby
Represented By: Charles E. Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond James Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Bryn Resser Pallesen
Represented By: Kevin M. Cuddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?