Evangelista et al v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Arturo Evangelista and Elenita Evangelista
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00139
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Trial by Court is set for 12/7/2020 at 9:00 AM in Anchorage Courtroom 3. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/24/2020 at 3:00 PM in Anchorage Courtroom 3. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 6/13/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 3, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Pretrial Order Planning & Scheduling Conference Report by Arturo Evangelista. (Feronti, Nicholas)
May 31, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC.(Brown, Jessica)
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE INITIAL SCHEDULING & PLANNING CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. Signed by Judge Sharon L. Gleason on 5/23/19. (Attachments: #1 Scheduling and Planning Conference Report)(JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 SLG TEXT ORDER: The Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint, at docket #8 , is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall file its Answer by 5/31/2019. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Brown, Jessica)
May 21, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Documents from Superior Court by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC (Brown, Jessica)
May 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC (Brown, Jessica)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Brown, Jessica)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Removal to Adverse Party by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Brown, Jessica)
May 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC from Superior Court, Third Judicial District at Anchorage, case number 3AN-19-6208 CI. (Filing fee $400/Receipt #ANC015763), filed by Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Docket Information, #2 Exhibit B Complaint, #3 Exhibit C Entry of Appearance, #4 Exhibit D Unoppose Motion)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Evangelista et al v. Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrington Mortgage Services, LLC
Represented By: Jessica M.Y. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arturo Evangelista
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Beardsley
Represented By: Nicholas Clark Feronti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elenita Evangelista
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Beardsley
Represented By: Nicholas Clark Feronti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?