Macdonald-Miller Facility Solutions, Inc. v. Marsh Creek, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Macdonald-Miller Facility Solutions, Inc.
Defendant: Kaktovik Telecom, LLC and Marsh Creek, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00143
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Cover Sheet, Order re Motion to Dismiss served on Matthew Rexford of Kaktovik Telecom on 6/19/2019, filed by Macdonald-Miller Facility Solutions, Inc.. (Wright, Christopher)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 6/11/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 22, 2019 Summons Issued as to Kaktovik Telecom, LLC(an Alaska Limited Liability Company), Marsh Creek, LLC. (KXC, COURT STAFF)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Marsh Creek, LLC, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Kaktovik Telecom, LLC)(KXC, COURT STAFF)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (KXC, COURT STAFF)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kaktovik Telecom, LLC(an Alaska Limited Liability Company), Marsh Creek, LLC (Filing fee $400 / receipt #ANC015776), filed by Macdonald-Miller Facility Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(KXC, COURT STAFF) Modified on 5/22/2019 to reflect date filed (KXC, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Macdonald-Miller Facility Solutions, Inc. v. Marsh Creek, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kaktovik Telecom, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marsh Creek, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Macdonald-Miller Facility Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher A. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?