Williams v. City of Kotzebue Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Russell Whittier Williams, III
Defendant: City of Kotzebue Inc. and Alcohol Beverage Control Board Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv00147
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to R. Williams, III re #7 . (LMH, COURT STAFF)
July 8, 2019 Filing 9 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to R. Williams, III re #6 . (LMH, COURT STAFF)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 Returned/Undeliverable Mail addressed to R. Williams, III re Clerk's Notice re Nature of Suit. (LMH, COURT STAFF)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 6/28/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Complaint, at docket #1 , is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. This dismissal constitutes a "strike". The Application to Waive Prepayment of Filing Fee, at docket #3 , is DENIED. All other pending motions, notices, and declarations, are DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 6/27/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 26, 2019 CLERK'S NOTICE: The Nature of Suit shall be changed from 360 to 550 to reflect that this is a case filed by a prisoner. This change is administrative in nature only. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing by Russell Whittier Williams, III (PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing by Russell Whittier Williams, III (Attachments: #1 1, #2 2, #3 3, #4 3, #5 4, #6 5)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Russell Whittier Williams, III. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement)(KXC, COURT STAFF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet (KXC, COURT STAFF)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alcohol Beverage Control Board Inc, City of Kotzebue Inc., filed by Russell Whittier Williams, III. (Attachments: #1 1)(KXC, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Williams v. City of Kotzebue Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Kotzebue Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcohol Beverage Control Board Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell Whittier Williams, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?