Baker v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Gia Baker
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc. and Zimmer, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00159
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Close of Fact Discovery 6/26/20, Expert Witness Discovery Completed 9/28/2020, Dispositive Motions due by 10/26/2020. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 6/28/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 25, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. (Baxter, Lee)
June 21, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Baxter, Lee)
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 12, 2019 Filing 8 Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative Defenses by Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Baxter, Lee)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 21 days of service of this order. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. (Baxter, Lee)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc.. (Baxter, Lee)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Removal to Adverse Party by Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Baxter, Lee)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Baxter, Lee)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Alaska Superior Court, case number 3AN-19-06886 CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2709509), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Pleadings & Process, #3 Exhibit C - Zimmer Inc. Business Entity Report, #4 Exhibit D - Zimmer Biomet Holdings Business Entity Report)(Baxter, Lee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gia Baker
Represented By: Peter A. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Biomet Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Singer
Represented By: Lee Colin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew Singer
Represented By: Lee Colin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?