White et al v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Michael James White and Becky Ann White
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. and Zimmer, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00161
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-17): Pursuant to Rule 7. I of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Southern District of New York for the reasons stated in the order of October 3, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Paul A. Crotty. (CME, COURT STAFF)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 SLG TEXT ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion to stay proceedings and answer deadline pending transfer to Multidistrict Litigation. All proceedings in this action are hereby STAYED; and the July 8, 2019, deadline to file an Answer to the Complaint is hereby STRICKEN. (RMC, COURT STAFF)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Transfer to MDL by Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit A - Transfer Order, #3 Exhibit B - CTO)(Baxter, Lee)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee Colin Baxter on behalf of Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. (Baxter, Lee)
June 7, 2019 Summons Issued as to Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Zimmer, Inc., (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Zimmer Holdings, Inc., #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Zimmer U.S., Inc.)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet. (Sandberg, Peter)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Becky Ann White, Michael James White. (Sandberg, Peter)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer, Inc., Zimmer, U.S., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2710409.), filed by Michael James White, Becky Ann White.(Sandberg, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White et al v. Zimmer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael James White
Represented By: Peter A. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Becky Ann White
Represented By: Peter A. Sandberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Lee Colin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, U.S., Inc.
Represented By: Lee Colin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer, Inc.
Represented By: Lee Colin Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?