Dunham v. Turnagain Marine Construction Corporation
Plaintiff: Steven Dunham
Defendant: Turnagain Marine Construction Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv00162
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE re #8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Nigel T. Stacey, at docket #8 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 1, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT Certificate in Good Standing by Steven Dunham. (Jacobsen, James)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT Certificate in Good Standing by Steven Dunham. (Jacobsen, James)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Steven Dunham. Turnagain Marine Construction Corporation waiver sent on 6/10/2019, answer due 8/9/2019. (Jacobsen, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Nigel Stacey. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2729009.) by Steven Dunham.(Stacey, Nigel)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 6/25/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald K. McLean on behalf of Turnagain Marine Construction Corporation (McLean, Donald)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: At docket #1 , plaintiff filed a complaint erroneously labelled as a counterclaim. The same document is correctly filed as a complaint at docket 2. The document at docket 1 is hereby stricken. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 10, 2019 Docket Annotation: Wrong Event Selected re: #1 Counterclaim, Complaint filed by Steven Dunham and should be disregarded. Attorney has refile the document using the correct event at docket 2. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 10, 2019 Summons Issued as to Turnagain Marine Construction Corporation. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 Unissued summons re Defendant Turnagain Marine Construction Corporation. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet. (Jacobsen, James)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT of Plaintiff Steven Dunham against Turnagain Marine Construction Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2711404.), filed by Steven Dunham.(Jacobsen, James)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 **STRICKEN** COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs Steven Dunham, COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2711303.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Jacobsen, James) Modified on 6/10/2019 to indicate error. See 6/10/19 Docket Annotation (JLH, COURT STAFF). Modified on 6/12/2019 to indicate stricken per order at dkt 5 (JLH, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dunham v. Turnagain Marine Construction Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Dunham
Represented By: James P. Jacobsen
Represented By: Joseph S. Stacey
Represented By: Nigel T. Stacey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Turnagain Marine Construction Corporation
Represented By: Donald K. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?