Francisco v. Saul
Plaintiff: David Losongco Francisco
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security and Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 3:2019cv00163
Filed: June 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Ralph R Beistline
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 RRB TEXT ORDER: The Motion and Application of Non-Eligible Attorney for Permission to Appear and Participate in the United States District Court for the District of Alaska at Docket #7 is GRANTED. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the application to appear pro hac vice by David F. Chermol at Docket 7 is authorized under D. Alaska L.R. 83.1(d). (LLR, CHAMBERS STAFF)
July 8, 2019 Docket Annotation: Andrew Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, represented by Richard L. Pomeroy and Jeffrey E. Staples substituted for Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to FRCvP 25(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney David F. Chermol. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2724236.) by David Losongco Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Request for Leave to Proceed Without Local Counsel, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order)(Chermol, David)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey E. Staples on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Staples, Jeffrey)
June 25, 2019 Docket Annotation: For the purpose of tracking the briefing as ordered at docket #5 , when filing the Opening Brief the attorney shall file the document using the event Motion Miscellaneous Relief and text in the relief being sought. Responsive filings should be filed using the event Response in Opposition to Motion or Response to Motion (Non-Opposition). The reply, if any, shall be filed using the event Reply to Response to Motion. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SOCIAL SECURITY SCHEDULING ORDER: Agency record due 60 days after Defendant's initial appearance. See Order for additional deadlines. Signed by Judge Ralph R. Beistline on 6/25/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Pomeroy on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Pomeroy, Richard)
June 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Commissioner of Social Security, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney General, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant U.S. Attorney)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 12, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2713176.), filed by David Losongco Francisco. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chermol, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Francisco v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Losongco Francisco
Represented By: David F. Chermol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Richard L. Pomeroy
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Staples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?