United States of America v. $6,672.00 in United States Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $6,672.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2019cv00174
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: H Russel Holland
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER re Notice to Counsel. Plaintiff to move case forward or, on or before August 21, 2019, file a report explaining the lack of progress in this case. (JDS, COURT STAFF)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER re Notice to Counsel. Plaintiff to file proof of execution of the warrant of arrest and proceed with all required noticed and publication. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Issuance of Warrant in rem. Signed by Judge H. Russel Holland on 6/19/19. cc: USM (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant in rem by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Warrant of Arrest In Rem)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED COMPLAINT FOR FORFEITURE IN REM against $6,672.00 in United States Currency, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of DEA SA Thanh Churchin)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $6,672.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $6,672.00 in United States Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kelly A. Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?