Gagnon v. Hal P. Gazaway and Associates, LLC
Plaintiff: Rebecca Gagnon
Defendant: Hal P. Gazaway and Associates, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv00178
Filed: June 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 16, 2019 Filing 12 JWS TEXT ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply re #9 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. The motion at docket 11 to extend the time for filing defendant's reply memorandum thru August 26, 2019, is granted for good cause shown. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #10 Response in Opposition to Motion by Hal P. Gazaway and Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply, #2 Proposed Order Order for Extension of Time to File Reply)(Gazaway, Hal)
August 10, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTION TO STAY filed by Rebecca Gagnon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Dudukgian, Goriune)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Hal P. Gazaway and Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss or Stay, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Dismiss, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order to Stay)(Gazaway, Hal)
July 26, 2019 Filing 8 JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: The motion at docket #5 to extend time for filing Defendant's Answer thru July 29, 2019, is granted. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Hal P. Gazaway re #5 First MOTION for Leave to File by Hal P. Gazaway and Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Hal P. Gazaway in support of Motion for Extension of Time)(Gazaway, Hal)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Hal P. Gazaway on behalf of Hal P. Gazaway and Associates, LLC (Gazaway, Hal)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 First MOTION for Leave to File by Hal P. Gazaway and Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Entry of Appearance, #2 Affidavit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Extension of Time, #3 Proposed Order Order for Extension of Time)(Gazaway, Hal)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 7/2/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
June 25, 2019 Summons Issued as to Hal P. Gazaway and Associates, LLC. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Hal P. Gazaway and Associates, LLC. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
June 25, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Dudukgian, Goriune)
June 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against Hal P. Gazaway and Associates, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2719840.), filed by Rebecca Gagnon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Letter from Defendant to Plaintiff)(Dudukgian, Goriune)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gagnon v. Hal P. Gazaway and Associates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hal P. Gazaway and Associates, LLC
Represented By: Hal P. Gazaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Gagnon
Represented By: Goriune Dudukgian
Represented By: James J. Davis, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?