Bank of America, N.A. v. Berdeaux
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Defendant: Brandy Crystal Berdeaux
Case Number: 3:2019cv00193
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Deborah M Smith
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 JUDGMENT: It is Ordered that this action is REMANDED to the Third Judicial District of the State of Alaska, at Palmer for lack of jurisdiction. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion for Reconsideration re #1 Notice of Removal filed by Brandy Crystal Berdeaux. This action is remanded to the Alaska District Court per case number 3PA-19-01408CI. The Clerk of Court is directed to refund Ms. Berdeauxs filing fee. The Clerk of Court is instructed to serve a copy of this order on state court proceeding 3PA-19-01408CI. This case is closed. No further filings will be accepted. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 8/27/2019. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
August 6, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Reconsideration Opposition to Order of Remand re #3 Order by Brandy Crystal Berdeaux. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Copy of Order)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Remand. This action is remanded to the Alaska District Court per case number 3PA-19-01408CI. (See order for full details.). Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 8/1/2019. (BJK, COURT STAFF)
July 23, 2019 Filing fee: $400, receipt number ANC015974 (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 10, 2019 Notice of Assignment to a US Magistrate Judge and Declination of Consent form. Please Note: Forms must NOT be electronically filed with the Court. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/31/2019. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 10, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Brandy Crystal Berdeaux from State of Alaska, Third Judicial District at Palmer, case number 3PA-19-01408CI. ( Filing fee $400/Not Paid), filed by Brandy Crystal Berdeaux. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(PXS, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of America, N.A. v. Berdeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandy Crystal Berdeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: George M. Cruickshank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?