First Bank v. EXODUS, Official No. 960616 et al
Plaintiff: First Bank
Defendant: EXODUS, Official No. 960616, F.J. Hankins Enterprises, Inc. and Fred J. Hankins
Case Number: 3:2019cv00200
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: Sharon L Gleason
Referring Judge: Deborah M Smith
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 DMS TEXT ORDER as to Fred J. Hankins GRANTING #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: Mr. Hankins has alleged that at the time of service he was consistently out of town running his business. He requests additional time to find an attorney for representation. The Court finds that this constitutes good cause under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 6(b). The defendants, EXODUS O.N. 960616, Mr. Hankins, and F.J. Hankins Enterprises, Inc., shall have an additional 14 days to file an answer to the plaintiffs complaint. The answer must be filed no later than close of business, Tuesday, September 17, 2019. Signed by Judge Deborah M. Smith on 9/3/2019. (ELH, CHAMBERS STAFF)
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Fred J. Hankins.(PXS, COURT STAFF)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 DECLARATION of John E Casperson re #7 MOTION for Entry of Default Unopposed Motion For Entry of Default Against Fred J. Hankins and Hankins Enterprises, Inc. by First Bank. (Casperson, John)
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Default Unopposed Motion For Entry of Default Against Fred J. Hankins and Hankins Enterprises, Inc. by First Bank. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Casperson, John)
August 7, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint to Foreclose Preferred Ship Mortgage In Rem, Enforcement of Security Interest, and for Debt, Exhibits served on F.J. Hankins Enterprises, Inc. on July 28, 2019, filed by First Bank. (Casperson, John)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint to Foreclose Preferred Ship Mortgage In Rem, Enforcement of Security Interest, and for Debt, Exhibits served on Fred J. Hankins on July 28, 2019, filed by First Bank. (Casperson, John)
July 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE: The above-referenced case is referred to Magistrate Judge Deborah M. Smith for disposition or findings and recommendations as appropriate pursuant to D.Ak.LMR 4:(5) Preferred ship mortgage foreclosures. (CME, COURT STAFF)
July 19, 2019 Summons Issued as to F.J. Hankins Enterprises, Inc., Fred J. Hankins. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Unissued summons re Defendant Fred J. Hankins, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant F.J. Hankins Enterprise, Inc.)(PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 Civil Cover Sheet. (Casperson, John)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EXODUS, Official No. 960616, F.J. Hankins Enterprises, Inc., Fred J. Hankins ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2730600.), filed by First Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Casperson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: First Bank v. EXODUS, Official No. 960616 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EXODUS, Official No. 960616
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F.J. Hankins Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fred J. Hankins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Bank
Represented By: John E. Casperson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?