Alaska Aerospace Corporation v. BRPH Architects-Engineers, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alaska Aerospace Corporation
Defendant: BRPH Architects-Engineers, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv00206
Filed: July 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Alaska
Presiding Judge: John W Sedwick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 10/17/2019. Discovery due by 9/19/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2020. See document for all other deadlines. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 9/19/19. (GMM, CHAMBERS STAFF)
September 18, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cook, Adam)
August 20, 2019 Filing 13 INITIAL CASE STATUS REPORT/CASE SCHEDULING AND PLANNING ORDER: Counsel for plaintiff shall serve and file the Rule 26 Meeting Report within 28 days of service of this order. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 20, 2019 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE re #10 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Stanton Phillip Beck, at docket #10 , is authorized under D.Ak. LR 83.1(d). (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF LODGING STATE COURT DOCUMENT(S) by BRPH Architects-Engineers, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Affidavit of Service, #4 Notice of Removal)(Jamieson, Brewster)
August 13, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear as Pro Hac Vice (Non-Resident ) Attorney Stanton P. Beck. ( Pro Hac Vice Admission fee $150.00 paid. Receipt number 097--2742470.) by BRPH Architects-Engineers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Beck, Stanton)
August 12, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT SERVICE LIST by BRPH Architects-Engineers, Inc. (Jamieson, Brewster)
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by BRPH Architects-Engineers, Inc..(Jamieson, Brewster)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGE SEDWICK TEXT ORDER: The Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time, at docket #6 , is hereby GRANTED. Defendant BRPH shall respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by 8/9/2019. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Unopposed by BRPH Architects-Engineers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jamieson, Brewster)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE MOTIONS TO DISMISS: Advising counsel of the procedure to follow prior to filing a motion to dismiss. Signed by Judge John W. Sedwick on 8/6/19. (JLH, COURT STAFF)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal: Service list due within 10 days. State Court documents due within 20 days. (PXS, COURT STAFF)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet. (Jamieson, Brewster)
July 30, 2019 Filing 2 DECLARATION of Brewster H. Jamieson re #1 Notice of Removal, by BRPH Architects-Engineers, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Complaint)(Jamieson, Brewster)
July 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by BRPH Architects-Engineers, Inc. from Superior Court for Alaska at Anchorage, case number 3AN-19-08224CI. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2735712), filed by BRPH Architects-Engineers, Inc..(Jamieson, Brewster)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alaska District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alaska Aerospace Corporation v. BRPH Architects-Engineers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaska Aerospace Corporation
Represented By: Shane Cassidy Coffey
Represented By: Adam W. Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRPH Architects-Engineers, Inc.
Represented By: Brewster H. Jamieson
Represented By: Stanton Phillip Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?